skip to content

Coroneos, Christopher James

CPSO#: 93588

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital & Cancer Center
B3-135
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 44369
Fax: (905) 389-7942 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Coroneos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Coroneos ( CPSO# 93588 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
B3-135
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JAMES CORONEOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORONEOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2018