skip to content

Cormier, Andrew Joseph Christopher

CPSO#: 100623

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Amherstburg Family Health Team
Unit 101
721 Front Road South
Amherstburg ON  N9V 2M4
Phone: (519) 736-7770
Fax: 519-736-7702 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: 519-254-5577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: 519-973-4411
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW JOSEPH CHRISTOPHER CORMIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORMIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015