skip to content

Corkum, Casey Gregory

CPSO#: 90746

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Summerville
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
7th Floor
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 272-9900
Fax: (905) 272-9977 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Sports Clinic
University of Toronto Mississauga
R A W Centre
3359 Mississauga Road North
Mississauga ON  L5L 1C6
Canada
Phone: (905) 820-9292
Fax: (905) 820-9250
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Suite 120
2695 North Sheridan Way
Mississauga ON  L5K 2P8
Canada
Phone: 9053623508
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Casey Gregory Corkum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Corkum ( CPSO# 90746 )

Business Address:
3359 Mississauga Road North
Mississauga ON  L5L 1C6
Phone Number: (905) 820-9292

Business Address:
Trillium Summerville
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
7th Floor
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 272-9900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CASEY GREGORY CORKUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORKUM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011