skip to content

Cordovani, Ligia de Almeida Ferreira

CPSO#: 94650

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Mar 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sao Paulo, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Cordovani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cordovani ( CPSO# 93332 )
Dr. L. Cordovani ( CPSO# 94650 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Anesthesia
Suite HSC-2V9
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
3rd Floor
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Feb 2011 to 15 Mar 2011
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 16 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jan 2013
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2013