skip to content

Cordovani, Daniel

CPSO#: 93332

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Sao Paulo, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Anesthesia HSC 2V9
1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75171
Fax: (905) 523-1224 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Cordovani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cordovani ( CPSO# 93332 )
Dr. L. Cordovani ( CPSO# 94650 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
3rd Floor
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Anesthesia
Suite HSC-2V9
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Brazil

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:01 Jul 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Jul 2010
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 29 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2019 Active
             1.    Dr. Daniel Cordovani may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Anesthesia,  McMaster  University,  in which Dr. Cordovani holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires when Dr. Cordovani
                  no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.