skip to content

Cordos, Mihaela Codruta

CPSO#: 89807

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Sep 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 May 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cluj, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Elder Care Centre
243 Consumer's Road, 3rd floor
North York ON  M2J 4W8
Phone: 416 756 6871 Ext. 8059
Fax: 416 756 6438 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Memory Program
1 Valleybrook Drive suite 400
Toronto ON  M3B 2S7
Canada
Phone: (416) 386-9761
Fax: (416) 386-0458
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mihaela Cordos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cordos ( CPSO# 89807 )

Business Address:
Suite 400
1 Valleybrook Drive
Toronto ON  M3B 2S7
Phone Number: (416) 386-9761

Business Address:
NYGH
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6454

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Sep 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MIHAELA CODRUTA CORDOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORDOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2008 to 01 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2009 to 01 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2011