skip to content

Copeland, Laura Lee

CPSO#: 90310

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Mar 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 24 Mar 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ohio State University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Get Well Clinic
649 Sheppard Ave W
North York ON  M3H2S4
Phone: 4165085691
Fax: 6474787604 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit C2
180 Sudbury Street
Toronto ON  M6J 0A8
Canada
Phone: 647-524-6216
Fax: 855-344-9519
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:24 Mar 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2020 Active
 Dr.  Laura  Lee  Copeland  may  practise  medicine  independently  in emergency
            medicine and medical psychotherapy.