skip to content

Cooper, Marvin

CPSO#: 19660

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jan 2019
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jan 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Aug 1965

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Marvin Cooper Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2019
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Paitents seeking access to a copy of their records may contact:
1162 Weston Rd
Toronto ON M6M 4P4
Date Received: 05 Dec 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:17 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2019