skip to content

Cooper, Joel Anthony

CPSO#: 98050

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
60 Bell Farm Rd, Unit #1
Barrie ON  L4M 5G6
Phone: 705-728-8778
Fax: 705-728-3053 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Cooper and Rossoni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cooper ( CPSO# 98050 )
Dr. M. Rossoni ( CPSO# 98348 )

Business Address:
Barrie Vascular Associates
50 Alliance Boulevard
Barrie ON  L4M 5K3
Phone Number: (705) 728-8778

Business Address:
5 - 211 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 797-0800

Business Address:
370 Bayview Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 0M7
Phone Number: (705) 721-0370

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Vascular Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOEL ANTHONY COOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOPER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Vascular Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Vascular Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Vascular Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Vascular Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017