skip to content

Cooper, Jerry Jacob Irving

CPSO#: 18678

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 17 Jun 1963

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

RSRS
111 St. Regis Crescent S
Toronto ON M3J 1Y6

416-398-0638
Date Received: 10 May 2019


Instructions/Address:

Paitents seeking access to a copy of their records can contact: 
RSRS
Tel: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: 416-398-5932
Date Received: 09 Nov 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:27 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019