skip to content

Cooke, Theodore Derek Vernon

CPSO#: 21945

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Jun 1969

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge School of Clinic, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Derek Cooke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 10 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: 271 Mica Point Rd R R 3 Maberly, Ontario K0H 2B0 Canada
Date Received: 22 Jun 2020


Instructions: Paitents seeking a copy of their medical record may send a written request to: [email protected] or via mail to: RR# 3 271 Mica Point Rd Maberly, ON K0H 2B0 or contact Dr.Cooke via 613 - 279 - 1217
Date Received: 31 Jul 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:17 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020