skip to content

Cooke, Michael John

CPSO#: 23454

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Feb 1982
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Feb 1982

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leeds, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (416) 5089475 Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOHN COOKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOKE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 May 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 1982