skip to content

Cooke, Kristy Anne Martha

CPSO#: 84846

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Dec 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Frontenac Doctors
Unit 7
730 Front Road
Kingston ON  K7M 6P7
Phone: (613) 384-7640
Fax: (613) 634-8595 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Wolfe Island Medical Clinic
102 County Rd 95
Wolfe Island ON  K0H 2Y0
Canada
Phone: 613-384-7640
Fax: 613-634-8595
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Kristy A M Cooke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Cooke ( CPSO# 84846 )

Business Address:
Reddendale Family Health Centre
Unit 7
730 Front Road
Kingston ON  K7M 6P7
Phone Number: (613) 384-4664

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KRISTY ANNE MARTHA COOKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2010 to 20 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 21 Jun 2010 to 20 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 21 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2011