skip to content

Cooke, Christy-Lynn Marie

CPSO#: 84805

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:23 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2013