skip to content

Cook, Jolene Margaret

CPSO#: 85944

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Aug 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 12 Feb 2007 to 12 Mar 2007
EL - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 13 Mar 2007 to 08 Apr 2007
EL - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2014