skip to content

Cook, Bruce Harvey Owen

CPSO#: 93259

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dingwall Medical Clinic
PO Box 3011
40 Goodall Street
Dryden ON  P8N 2Z6
Phone: (807) 223-6683
Fax: (807) 223-4733 Electoral District: 09

Additional Practice Location(s)

58 Goodall Street
Dryden ON  P8N 2Y6
Canada
Phone: (806) 223-8295
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bruce H. O. Cook Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Cook ( CPSO# 93259 )

Business Address:
Dingwall Medical Clinic
40 Goodall Street
PO Box 3011
Dryden ON  P8N 2Z6
Phone Number: (807) 223-6683

Business Address:
58 Goodall Street
Dryden ON  P8N 2Z6
Phone Number: (807) 223-8200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRUCE HARVEY OWEN COOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012