skip to content

Conway, Melanie Robin

CPSO#: 100388

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: Steele, Melanie Robin (used until: 23 Sep 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Paediatric Immunology and Allergy
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Hospital for Sick Children
Paediatric Emergency Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416)813-1500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 301
3292 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 4J5
Canada
Phone: (416) 733-7772
Fax: (416) 224-9880
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MELANIE ROBIN CONWAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONWAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 06 Sep 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017