skip to content

Connors, Lori Ann

CPSO#: 87166

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Sep 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:10 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective:02 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 09 Jul 2007 to 27 Jul 2007
EL - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 03 Sep 2007 to 21 Sep 2007
EL - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 15 Sep 2008 to 14 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 15 Sep 2009 to 14 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011