skip to content

Connor, Ashton Antoine

CPSO#: 91256

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2019