skip to content

Connolly, Rory Daniel

CPSO#: 100850

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
E Main Room EM 206
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19002 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rory Connolly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Connolly ( CPSO# 100850)

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RORY DANIEL CONNOLLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONNOLLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018