skip to content

Connolly, Katherine

CPSO#: 96414

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Ave East
Hamilton, ON
L8N 4A6
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: 905-522-1155 Ext. 32720
Fax: 905-521-6068 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: 905 521 2100 Ext. 43720
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: K. Connolly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Connolly ( CPSO# 96414 )

Business Address:
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: 905 522 1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:31 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KATHERINE CONNOLLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONNOLLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Oct 2018
CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Oct 2019
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015