skip to content

Connelly, Kim Alexander

CPSO#: 85503

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Apr 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Apr 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Melbourne, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Queen Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5263 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Connelly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Connelly ( CPSO# 85503 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Queen Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 518-1570

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective:01 Apr 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 11 Aug 2006 to 20 Oct 2006
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 21 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Mar 2009
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Oct 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Oct 2016 Active
             Dr. Kim Alexander Connelly may practise medicine independently in cardiology.