skip to content

Comisarow, Richard Harold

CPSO#: 23370

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Nov 2020
EXPIRY DATE
01 Nov 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 23 Jul 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. R. H. Comisarow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Medical Records Location

Address: Urology Associates 305-2830 Keele St Toronto, ON M3M 3E5
Date Received: 21 Oct 2020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:06 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 1975
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2005
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jul 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Nov 2020

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: July 23, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Richard Harold Comisarow to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 23, 2018:

The College conducted an investigation into Dr. Comisarow's standard of practice and conduct in his practice of urology. Dr. Comisarow has since retired from the practice of urology and agreed not to engage in the practice of urology.