skip to content

Colter, Ashley Lind

CPSO#: 97899

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305 - 1 Huron Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C3
Phone: (705) 445-4111
Fax: (705) 445-8250 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Campbell House Hospice
240 Erie Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 0X8
Canada
Phone: 705-444-2555
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Colter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 24 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ASHLEY LIND COLTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 15 Dec 2014 to 31 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2015