skip to content

Colpitts, Melanie Helena

CPSO#: 90379

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Dec 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Dec 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orillia Paediatric Teaching Assoc.
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 327-9143
Fax: (705) 327-9189 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

186 Erie Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y1P6
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M.H. Colpitts Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Colpitts ( CPSO# 90379 )

Business Address:
Orillia Paediatric Teaching Associates
Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 327-9143

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MELANIE HELENA COLPITTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLPITTS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 04 May 2009 to 31 May 2009
EL - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2010