skip to content

Colman, Pamela Jane

CPSO#: 30833

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Apr 2021
EXPIRY DATE
01 Apr 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Cincinnati Health Network 40 F McMicken Ave Cincinnati Ohio 45202
Date Received: 31 Mar 2021


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Apr 2021