skip to content

Collins-Williams, Donald

CPSO#: 29789

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 08 Oct 2020
EXPIRY DATE
08 Oct 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Feb 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Donald Collins-Williams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 1 2021

Medical Records Location

Address: Summerville Family Health Team 1221 Bloor St E Mississauga, ON L4Y 2N8
Instructions: Contact abbove
Date Received: 08 Oct 2020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Oct 2020