skip to content

Collins, Kenneth Mark

CPSO#: 95187

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Feb 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Emergency Department
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2368
Fax: (613) 548-1374 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trenton Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6
Canada
Phone: (613) 392-2540 Ext. 5467
Fax: (613) 961-5503
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Belleville General Hospital
Emergency Department
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
Phone: (613) 969-7400 Ext. 2435
Fax: (613) 969-9835
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: KM Collins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 03 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Collins ( CPSO# 95187 )

Business Address:
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
Trenton Memorial Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6
Phone Number: (613) 392-2540

Business Address:
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:17 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KENNETH MARK COLLINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLLINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2014