skip to content

Collins, Jessica Saya

CPSO#: 86833

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Colin-Durand, Jessica (used until: 23 Jun 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5893 Copley Drive
4th floor plastic surgery
San Diego CA  92111
United States
Phone: (858) 616-5011

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JESSICA SAYA COLLINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLLINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012