skip to content

Collins, David Christopher

CPSO#: 22822

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jun 1970
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 21 Nov 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 111
210 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 7V1
Phone: (705) 325-4434
Fax: (705) 325-7221 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. David Christopher Collins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Collins ( CPSO# 22822 )

Business Address:
Unit 111
210 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 7V1
Phone Number: (705) 325-4434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 21 Nov 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 21 Nov 2019 Active
             As from November 21, 2019, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. David Christopher
            Collins in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Collins to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. DAVID CHRISTOPHER COLLINS
                                          ("Dr. Collins")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Collins, certificate of registration number 22822, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Collins, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation
                  bearing File Number 1106213 into a public complaint about my care of a
                  patient at a long term care home (the "Investigation")

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Collins, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.



            (5)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Collins, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   The University of Toronto Medical Record-Keeping Course; 
                  
                        (ii)  2000-word written review of:
                  
                              1.    CPSO Practice Guide; and
                  
                              2.    CPSO Medical Records Policy. 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Collins, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Collins, undertake to complete this requirement within three
                        (3) months of signing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Collins, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
            (6)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Collins, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Professional Education set out in section (5)
                        above, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice ("the
                        Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College
                        (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").  I acknowledge that the
                        Reassessment may include a chart review, direct observation of my
                        care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                        patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Collins, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Collins, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive
                        and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the
                        Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Collins, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment
                        will be provided to me and reported to the College and the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (7)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Collins, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Collins, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Collins, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Collins, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "B". 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Collins, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Collins, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (10)  I, Dr. Collins, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Collins, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr. Collins, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.
            (13)  I, Dr. Collins, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Collins, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Collins, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into a public complaint
                              regarding Dr. Collins' care of a patient at a long term care
                              home. As a result of the investigation:
                  
                                    Dr. Collins will engage in professional education in
                                    medical record keeping.
                  
                                    Dr. Collins's practice will be reassessed by an
                                    assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the
                                    completion of the professional education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Collins, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Collins, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Collins, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Collins, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (d)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: November 21, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. David Christopher Collins to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 21, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into a public complaint regarding Dr. Collins’ care of a patient at a long term care home. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Collins will engage in professional education in medical record keeping.

Dr. Collins’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the completion of the professional education.