skip to content

Collins, Carola Johanna Dorette

CPSO#: 88753

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Vanderspek, Carola Johanna Dorette (used until: 10 Aug 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
29 Noxon St
Ingersoll ON  N5C 1B8
Phone: 5194259000
Fax: 5194859609 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

Caressant Care Nursing Home
81 Fyfe Avenue
Woodstock ON  N4S8Y2
Canada
Phone: 5195396461
Fax: 5195395629
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Carola Collins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Collins ( CPSO# 88753 )

Business Address:
715180 Oxford Road 4
Woodstock ON  N4S 7V9
Phone Number: (519) 537-8515

Business Address:
81 Fyfe Avenue
Woodstock ON  N4S 8Y2
Phone Number: (519) 539-6461

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CAROLA JOHANNA DORETTE COLLINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLLINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010