skip to content

Collier, Amanda Teresa

CPSO#: 97812

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2368 Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMANDA TERESA COLLIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLLIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Jul 2019
CF - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017