skip to content

Coll-Black, Mary Celia

CPSO#: 91453

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare
Dept of Obstetrics&Gynecology
2nd Floor Fontbonne
301 James St S
Hamilton ON  L8N 2G9
Phone: (905) 521-6041
Fax: (905) 383-3336 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mary Coll-Black Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Coll-Black ( CPSO# 91453 )

Business Address:
McMaster University
Department of Obstetrics & Gynecology
St. Joseph's Hospital-2 Fontbonne Building
301 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8N 2G9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARY CELIA COLL-BLACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLL-BLACK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 29 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Sep 2015
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014