skip to content

Coles, John Gordon

CPSO#: 31974

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Jul 1984
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6204
Fax: (416) 813-7984 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Coles Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Coles ( CPSO# 31974 )

Business Address:
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Room 1518
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6204

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 09 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN GORDON COLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Oct 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1984