skip to content

Coleman, Elizabeth Jeanette

CPSO#: 96717

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Feb 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Feb 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Shores Centre for
Mental Health Sciences
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone: (905) 668-5881
Fax: (905) 430-4033 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Elizabeth Coleman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Coleman ( CPSO# 96717 )

Business Address:
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone Number: (905) 668-5881

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:03 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Psychiatry Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH JEANETTE COLEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLEMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Sep 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2013