skip to content

Cole, Howard John

CPSO#: 32058

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11 Elvina Gardens
Toronto ON  M4P 1X7
Phone: (416) 487-0993 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Howard Cole Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Cole ( CPSO# 32058 )

Business Address:
11 Elvina Gardens
Toronto ON  M4P 1X7
Phone Number: (416) 487-0993

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Past paitents of Dr. Cole can send an email request for a copy of their file to: dhowardcole@gmail.com
Date Received: 06 Dec 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019