skip to content

Colbourne, Amy Janice

CPSO#: 98335

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121 Ext. 5028 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Amy Colbourne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Colbourne ( CPSO# 98335 )

Business Address:
304 Bellevue Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 5G1
Phone Number: (705) 743-7100

Business Address:
105-380 Burnham Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 1T6
Phone Number: (705) 741-3489

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Business Address:
170 Simcoe Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 2H7
Phone Number: (705) 742-0783

Business Address:
150 Strickland Street
Lakefield ON  K0L 2H0
Phone Number: (705) 651-0505

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:03 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMY JANICE COLBOURNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLBOURNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Jan 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2018