Coke, Sarah Elizabeth (CPSO#: 98664)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Dec 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone: (807) 468-9861
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah E. Coke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Coke ( CPSO# 98664 )

Business Address:
Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-9861

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH ELIZABETH COKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 11 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Dec 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2016