skip to content

Coke, Robert Valere

CPSO#: 98507

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Limerick, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Av. W
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: 9058132200 Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT VALERE COKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 May 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2016