skip to content

Cohen-Silver, Justine Heather

CPSO#: 89205

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Paediatric Consult Clinic
3rd Floor Our lady of Mercy Wing
30 the Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6625
Fax: 416-530-6924 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

78 Seaforth Avenue
Parkdale Public School
St Joseph Health Center
Medical Clinic
Toronto ON  M6K3L2
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The Hospital for Sick children-Dept
of Emergency Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: 416-813-5807
Fax: 416-813-7038
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

MSPHI Nelson Mandela Park Public
school clinic
440 Shuter Street
Toronto ON  M5A 1X6
Canada
Phone: 416-393-1620 Ext. 20021
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

St. jamestown Family Health team
St. Michael's HOspital
410 sherbourne street 1st floor
Toronto ON  M4X 1K2
Canada
Phone: 416-864-3096
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Just for Kids Clinic,St. Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:16 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JUSTINE HEATHER COHEN-SILVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN-SILVER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 10 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 11 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 16 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 17 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 10 Jan 2016
CF - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2013