skip to content

Cohen-Lyons, Phillip Daniel

CPSO#: 93988

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2640 Rutherford Rd.
Suite 202
Vaughan ON  L4K 0H3
Phone: 647-352-9622
Fax: (905) 417-0765 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Cohen-Lyons Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Cohen-Lyons ( CPSO# 93988 )

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
202-2640 Rutherford Road
Vaughan ON  L4K 0H3
Phone Number: (905) 856-0771

Business Address:
1500-150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 350-5900

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:31 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:08 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PHILLIP DANIEL COHEN-LYONS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN-LYONS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014