skip to content

Cohen-Gelfand, Sara Nancy

CPSO#: 86718

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Sep 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
343 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3H 1T1
Phone: (416) 785-8412 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:03 May 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARA NANCY COHEN-GELFAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN-GELFAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 May 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 09 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 May 2009 to 09 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2010