skip to content

Cohen, Zane

CPSO#: 22788

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Feb 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Feb 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Unit 451
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 8346
Fax: (416) 586-8644 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Zane Cohen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Cohen ( CPSO# 22788 )

Business Address:
451 - 600 University Avenue
4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-1555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 04 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ZANE COHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Feb 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 1977