skip to content

Cohen, Steven Ralph

CPSO#: 30478

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The Hebrew University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: C/O Alesa Cohen Suite 300 1333 Neilson Road Scarborough, Ontario M1B 4Y9
Date Received: 15 Dec 2010


Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: 373 Brooke Avenue Toronto, Ontario M5M 2L5
Date Received: 12 Jul 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:01 Jan 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 2009