skip to content

Cohen, Steven Neill

CPSO#: 87382

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1001 Queen Street West
Unit 1 - 112
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 32132 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Steven N. Cohen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 28 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEVEN NEILL COHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2007