skip to content

Cohen, Nicole Francine

CPSO#: 89453

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dundee, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2200 Eglinton Ave W
2200 Eglinton
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-3552
Fax: 905-813-3570 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Geoffrey Cohen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cohen ( CPSO# 55982 )
Dr. N. Cohen ( CPSO# 89453 )

Business Address:
2 - 6981 Milcreek Drive
Mississauga ON  L5N 6B8
Phone Number: (289) 724-7246

Business Address:
9 - 5925 Grossbeak Drive
Mississauga ON  L5N 6S5
Phone Number: (905) 824-2467

Business Address:
2075 Hadwen Road
Mississauga ON  L5K 2L3
Phone Number: (905) 885-1860


Corporation Name: Nicole Cohen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 30 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Maternal Fetal Medicine Effective:31 Dec 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NICOLE FRANCINE COHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
AVP - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 24 Sep 2008 to 06 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 07 Jul 2009 to 06 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 07 Jul 2010 to 06 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 07 Jul 2011 to 06 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 07 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013