skip to content

Cohen, Michael Ryan

CPSO#: 84870

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Emergency Department
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4530
Fax: (905) 813-4548 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michael Cohen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cohen ( CPSO# 84870 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Emergency Department
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Oct 2006 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 26 Oct 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL RYAN COHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2006