skip to content

Cohen, Mark David

CPSO#: 31599

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jun 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5935 Bathurst St
North York ON  M2R 1Y8
Phone: (416) 223-4050 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

429 Walmer Rd
Toronto ON  M5P 2X9
Canada
Phone: (416) 967-6949
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mark Cohen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Corporation Name: Mark Cohen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cohen ( CPSO# 31599 )

Business Address:
33 Foursome Cres
North York ON  M2P 1W1
Phone Number: 6474007656

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARK DAVID COHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1980