skip to content

Coffey, Jessica Catherine

CPSO#: 97759

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
76 Stuart St
Kingston General Hospital
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7 Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JESSICA CATHERINE COFFEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COFFEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2019 to 23 Sep 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2020 to 14 Dec 2020
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2020