skip to content

Coates, Aileen Euphemia Horrell

CPSO#: 17175

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 13 Aug 1997
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Jun 1997

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1959
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jan 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 1997